CA SB253 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4064.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 369.5 and 739.5 of, and to add Section 369.4 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: psychotropic medication.
Sponsors
Sen. William Monning [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB253 Monning Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 253 Monning Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB253 Monning (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 253 Monning Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB253 Monning (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 5. Page 5323.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5885.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1295.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1150.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 818.) (April 28). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | April 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4064.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 369.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 739.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |