CA SB249 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66452.27 to the Government Code, relating to land use, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Land use: Subdivision Map Act: expiration dates.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 249 Nielsen Third Reading Urgency By Gallagher (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Date (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB249 Nielsen Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Date (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB249 Nielsen Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 366, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9 a.m. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3039.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 919.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 465.) (March 27). |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66452.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |