CA SB245 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Section 18930 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Food Assistance Program: eligibility and benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB245 Hurtado et al (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02AssemblyJuly 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 11).
2023-06-20AssemblyJune 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2023-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1162.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-04-10SenateApril 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2023-03-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 425.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2023-02-27SenateSet for hearing March 20.
2023-02-09SenateReferred to Com. on HUMANS S.
2023-01-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18930Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback