CA SB244 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 885, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 12 (commencing with Section 53170) to Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 12800.7 and 12801.9 of the Vehicle Code, and to add Section 17852 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Privacy: personal information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 244 Lara Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB244 Lara Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB244 Lara (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 885, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6194.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2018-08-29AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2018-08-16AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Chiu.
2017-09-14AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2017-09-08AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2017-09-08AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2017-09-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1).
2017-09-01AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2017-08-30AssemblyAugust 30 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-07-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 11).
2017-07-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2017-06-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P.
2017-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1387.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-26SenatePublished May 26 at 10 a.m.
2017-05-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25).
2017-05-19SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2017-05-15SenateMay 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-05SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 851.) (April 25).
2017-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-04-19SenateApril 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code30Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1798.785New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code48204.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code49073.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66021.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code66021.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code68130.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69508.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code70036Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code99155Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53170New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code6254Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code6254.34New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code128371Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code12800.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code12801.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code13005.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14007.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code17852New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code1905Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code204Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback