CA SB238 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 9.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 51 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 12920, 12940, and 12955 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 1102 of the Labor Code, relating to civil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination: political affiliation: political belief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-21-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateApril 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 9.) Reconsideration granted.
2021-04-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-01-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code51Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12920Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12940Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12955Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1102Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback