CA SB237 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51430 and 51442 of the Education Code, relating to retroactive high school diplomas.
Title
High school diplomas: retroactive high school diplomas: veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB237 Calderon (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB237 Calderon (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and V.A. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 880.) (May 8). |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51442 | Amended Code | Citation Text |