CA SB226 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 676, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 676, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 837.5 to the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 10720.1, 10720.5, and 10722.2 of, and to add Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 10737) to Part 2.74 of Division 6 of, the Water Code, relating to groundwater.
Title
Sustainable Groundwater Management Act: groundwater adjudication.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB226 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 226 Pavley Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB226 Pavley (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Assembly - SB 226 Pavley Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB226 Pavley (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 676, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2750.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 3088.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and JUD. |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1098.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 818.) (April 28). |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 592.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. (Corrected April 9) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 837.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 105.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10720.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10720.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10720.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10721 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10722.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10735 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10735.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10737 | New Code | See Bill Text |