CA SB196 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 798.40 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 739.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to utility rates.
Title
Utility rates: mobilehomes and apartment buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB196 Cannella Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Assembly - SB 196 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB196 Cannella (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Assembly - SB 196 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-17 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB196 Cannella (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 201, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-08-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2555.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and H. & C.D. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 807.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 30). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 567.) (April 16). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 798.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |