CA SB196 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1255.1, 1255.2, and 1255.25 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services.
Title
Emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB196 Corbett (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Assembly - SB 196 Corbett Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB196 Corbett (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-01 - Assembly - SB 196 Corbett Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 49 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB196 Corbett (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Stricken from Senate file. | |
2009-10-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled. To Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2337.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-08 | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 2353.) | |
2009-09-04 | From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-09-03 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. | |
2009-09-02 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-09-01 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 2860.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-09 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 8.) | |
2009-06-30 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |
2009-06-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-05-21 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 974.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2009-04-14 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4. Page 420.) | |
2009-03-12 | Set for hearing April 1. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on HEALTH. | |
2009-02-24 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |