CA SB188 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4019.2, 4101, 4102, 4103, 4104, 4105, 4108, 4109, 4110, 4111, 4112, 4121, 4129, 4130, 4131, 4131.5, 4133, 4134, 4135, 4136, and 4137 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 4951, 4952, 4956, and 4957 of, and to add Section 4959 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to conservation camps.
Title
Conservation camps: county-operated camps.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 390.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and RLS. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |