CA SB188 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 527.85 to the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 273.6 of the Penal Code, relating to temporary restraining orders.
Title
Temporary restraining orders: private postsecondary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB188 Runner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 188 Runner Senate Third Reading By KNIGHT (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Education with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB188 Runner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-11 - Assembly - SB 188 Runner Senate Third Reading By KNIGHT (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Education with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB188 Runner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 566, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-11 | In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2429.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3361.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 10.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-09-09 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3230.) | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 3047.) Re-referred to Com. On JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2009-08-27 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-07-09 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-02 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-07-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-22 | To Coms. on JUD. and ED. | |
2009-06-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1187.) To Assembly. | |
2009-06-01 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-28 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. | |
2009-05-21 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 874.) | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 12. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 725.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-01 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-03-09 | To Coms. on ED. and JUD. | |
2009-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |