CA SB187 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12087.3 to the Government Code, to amend Sections 50807 and 50811 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 11.8 (commencing with Section 50811) of Part 2 of Division 31 of, to add Section 1530.90 to, to add Division 2.8 (commencing with Section 1890) to, and to repeal and add Section 130208 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 11166 and 11174.34 of the Penal Code, to add and repeal Sections 17131.12 and 17131.19 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 319, 319.3, 358.1, 361.2, 361.22, 366, 366.1, 366.3, 366.31, 636, 706.5, 706.6, 727.12, 727.2, 2200, 4094, 4094.2, 4094.5, 4096, 4096.6, 10609.4, 11004.1, 11266, 11330.7,11403, 11403.2, 11450, 11450.025, 11461, 11461.36, 11461.6, 11462, 11462.01, 11463, 11466.36, 12201.06, 12301.61, 16001, 16501.1, 16501.35, 16501.45, 16501.5, 16501.6, 16501.95, 16523.58, 16524.9, 16587, 16589, 18358.30, 18900.8, 18930, and 18995 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 18997.2 of, to amend and repeal Section 12301.24 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 13753, 13754, 13757, and 18930.5 of, to add Sections 2200.2, 2200.5, 2200.7, 8151.5, 11450.027, 12300.6, 15768, 18926.8, 18928.5, and 18997.3 to, to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 9156) to Chapter 2 of Division 8.5 of, to add Chapter 10.2 (commencing with Section 18936) to Part 6 of Division 9 of, to repeal Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 4362) of Part 3 of Division 4 of, and to repeal Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 8151) of Division 8 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend and repeal Section 135 of Chapter 27 of the Statutes of 2019, relating to public social services, and making an appropriation therefore, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 187 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB187 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB187 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB187 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB187 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 50, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:10 a.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 4535.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5597.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 5550.) |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rules suspended. |
2022-06-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 297.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |