CA SB173 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8594.14 and 13987 of, to add Sections 13986 and 14669.24 to, and to add and repeal Section 14108 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 75226 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 187010, 187022, 187030, 187032, and 187034 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Section 104.3 of, to add Section 2704.79 to, and to add and repeal Section 2196.3 of, the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Section 15 of Chapter 71 of the Statutes of 2022, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation budget trailer bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB173 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2024-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-06-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 5978.)
2024-06-24AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2024-06-24AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2024-06-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2024-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2023-03-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-03-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 509.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-03-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-03-16SenateOrdered to second reading.
2023-03-16SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.)
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2023-01-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18.
2023-01-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback