CA SB168 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10213.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, to amend Section 3 of Chapter 6 of the Statutes of 2021, to amend Section 263 of Chapter 116 of the Statutes of 2021, relating to child care, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - SB 168 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB168 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB168 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB168 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 261, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2574.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2961.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 2809.) |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 291.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10213.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |