CA SB167 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8386 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electrical corporations: wildfire mitigation plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB167 Dodd et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 167 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB167 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 167 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Quirk (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB167 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 403, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2609.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3041.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 818.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 464.) (March 27). |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 8386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |