CA SB163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1374.73 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10144.51 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: pervasive developmental disorder or autism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB163 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Assembly - SB 163 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Nazarian (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB163 Portantino (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13 Veto sustained.
2020-01-13 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by the Governor.
2019-09-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2830.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 3198.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 1221.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1091.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-04-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 576.) (April 3).
2019-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2019-03-14SenateApril 10 hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
2019-01-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 24.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1374.73Amended CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code10144.51Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback