CA SB163 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6005, 6006, 6007, 6008.1, 6008.4, 6010, 6011, 6013.6, 6015, 6016, 6018, 6019, 6020, 6021, 6024, 6033, 6036, 6037, 6040, 6042, 6046.7, 6069, 6070, 6076, 6076.5, 6079.5, 6086, 6086.5, 6086.14, 6140, 6140.01, 6140.05, 6140.5, 6141, 6161, 6168, 6169, 6170, 6190.1, 6200, 6201, 6203, 6204, 6206, 6222, 6225, 6226, 6231, and 6238 of, to add Sections 6001.1, 6009.7, 6012, 6013.2, 6013.3, 6013.5.5, 6026.7, and 6140.12 to, to add and repeal Section 6140.02 of, to repeal Sections 6012.5, 6013.4, 6014, and 6017 of, and to repeal and add Sections 6001.2 and 6013.1 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to attorneys.
Title
Attorneys: board of trustees: annual membership fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB163 Evans Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 163 Evans Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB163 Evans (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - From Committee: Amendments returned to Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 163 Evans Senate Third Reading By FEUER (Y: 68 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB163 Evans (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - From Committee: Amendments returned to Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2011-09-09 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2462.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 3114.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-06 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (September 6). | |
2011-09-02 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-09-01 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2769.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-13 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-07-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). | |
2011-06-21 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1278.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-06-01 | From committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1251.) (June 1). Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 1177.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-05-27 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-11 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 950.) (May 10). | |
2011-04-29 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-02-03 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |