CA SB16 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - September 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12993 of the Government Code, relating to civil rights.
Title
Civil rights: discrimination: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB16 Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB16 Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Assembly | September 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | July 12 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 1357.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1157.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 575.) (March 28). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12993 | Amended Code | Citation Text |