CA SB1558 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the payment of claims against the state, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Claims against the state: payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Assembly - SB 1558 Kehoe Third Reading Urgency By FUENTES (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1558 Kehoe Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1558 Kehoe Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-06-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-06-04 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 8. Page 5201.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-17 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 3396.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3144.) (April 12). | |
2012-04-10 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10630 | Amended Code | Citation Text |