CA SB1491 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on September 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5020, 5021, 5024, 5076, 5090, 5109, 5120, 5122, 6750, 6751, 6756, 6758, 6759, 6763, 6799, 7028.6, 7028.7, 7028.9, 7058.5, 7099.2, 7110, 7210.7, 7316, 7317, 7320.1, 7352, 7410, 8740, 8746, 8748, and 8805 of, and to repeal Section 5109.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 7054.6 and 8344 of, and to repeal Section 8340 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Aanestad [R] | Sen. Ronald Calderon [D] | Sen. Lou Correa [D] | Sen. Dean Florez [D] |
Sen. Gloria McLeod [D] | Sen. Jenny Oropeza [D] | Sen. Mimi Walters [R] | Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1491 Committee on B.P.&E.D. (Negrete M (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1491 B. P.& E.D. Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Special Consent #23 SB1491 Committee on B.P.&E.D. (Negrete M (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1491 B. P.& E.D. Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Special Consent #23 SB1491 Committee on B.P.&E.D. (Negrete M (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-28 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-25 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4905.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-23 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6538.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 6428.) To third reading. | |
2010-08-12 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2010-06-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-05-28 | To Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | |
2010-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3483.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-05 | Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-04-22 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-20 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3294.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-01 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-03-17 | To Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-03-12 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 11. | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |