CA SB1489 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 427, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 427, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8770 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 24011, 26945, 36934, 53325.1, 53330.5, 53601, 53646, 63035, 63048.94, 63089.98, 65913.11, 66301, 66434.1, 66466, 66499.55, and 66499.56 of, and to add Section 51255.1 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 22300 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Section 5366 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 3112, 3113, and 3114 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local Government Omnibus Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1489 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1489 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1489 GOV. & F (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1489 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1489 GOV. & F (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 427, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5340.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5830.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3673.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3545.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3460.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |