CA SB1476 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 891, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 891, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 60622 of, to repeal Sections 60606, 60608, 60610, 60612, and 60616 of, to repeal and add Section 60604 of, and to repeal, add, and repeal Section 60602 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water replenishment districts: contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1476 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1476 Bradford Senate Third Reading By McKinnor (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1476 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1476 Bradford Senate Third Reading By McKinnor (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1476 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 891, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4867.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5820.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3827.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3609.) (May 4). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 60604 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 60606 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60608 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60610 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60612 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60616 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60622 | Amended Code | Citation Text |