CA SB1447 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 130069.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to hospitals.
Title
Hospitals: seismic compliance: Children’s Hospital Los Angeles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 130069.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |