CA SB1443 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 5 (commencing with Section 49350) of Chapter 8 of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school safety, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
School safety: the County of Riverside school metal detector pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Set for hearing August 16. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | August 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 5202.) (August 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 49350 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2699 | Amended Code | Citation Text |