CA SB1423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2750.4 to the Labor Code, relating to worker classification.
Title
Worker classification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2020-05-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2750.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1423 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1423 |