CA SB1410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 314.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities: inspection and audit of books and records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1410 Morrell (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4938.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code314.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback