CA SB1403 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2790 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home weatherization for low-income customers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1403 Hueso (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2020-06-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3540.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2020-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2790Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback