CA SB1403 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 370, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39719.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Clean Truck, Bus, and Off-Road Vehicle and Equipment Technology Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1403 Lara Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1403 Lara (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 370, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-13 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6061.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6719.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-15AssemblyAugust 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4315.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4310.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10).
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code130278Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code39719.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback