CA SB1402 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to submit an advisory question to the voters relating to immigration reform, calling an election, to take effect immediately.
Title
Immigration reform: advisory election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SB1402 De Le (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3418.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3234.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84307.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 2928 | Amended Code | Citation Text |