CA SB1390 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1808.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Motor Vehicles: records: confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateApril 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4700.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2538.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code1808.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback