CA SB1382 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 31452.5, 31520.5, 31592.5, and 31693 of, and to add Sections 31471.5 and 31592.6 to, the Government Code, relating to county employees' retirement.
Title
County employees' retirement: retiree organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1382 Negrete McLeod Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - SB 1382 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By FURUTANI (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1382 Negrete McLeod (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - SB 1382 Negrete McLeod Senate Third Reading By FURUTANI (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1382 Negrete McLeod (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 178, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:15 a.m. | |
2012-08-06 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4375.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-06-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-06-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 5527.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). | |
2012-06-11 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-04-16 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-04-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 3163.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3104.) (April 9). | |
2012-03-29 | Set for hearing April 9. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing March 26. Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 31452.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31471.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 31520.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31592.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 31592.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 31693 | Amended Code | Citation Text |