CA SB1372 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21665 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to aviation.
Title
Airports: third-party vendors: security lanes.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1372 Newman (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Assembly | July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 4132.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 3733.) (April 23). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | April 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 21665 | New Code | See Bill Text |