CA SB1357 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3060 of the Government Code, relating to public officers.
Title
Removal from office: grand jury accusation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Assembly - SB 1357 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1357 Cannella (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Special Consent #10 SB1357 Cannella (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2012-07-02 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5563.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-18 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-14 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3496.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-09 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3389.) (May 1). | |
2012-04-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing May 1. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3023.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-13 | Set for hearing March 27. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-25 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |