CA SB1343 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 487.010 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.
Title
Civil procedure: property subject to attachment.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 487.010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15657.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |