CA SB1328 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3090 and 3093 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mileage-based road usage fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-12SenateApril 16 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code3090Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code3093Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback