CA SB1325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 52.35 to the Civil Code, and to add Part 8 (commencing with Section 122500) to Division 105 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Peaceful and Natural Dignity Act: the right of self-quarantine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 0 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 8. Page 4747.) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 52.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122500 | New Code | See Bill Text |