CA SB1309 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7296, 7299.2, 7299.4, 7299.5, 7299.6, 11435.40, 11435.45, 11435.50, 18522, 18524, 18538, 18573, 18576, 18720, 18720.1, 18720.3, 18720.4, 18901, 18901.5, 18902, 18906, 18930, 18930.5, 18934, 18935, 18938, 18938.5, 18938.6, 18939, 18990, 18991, 18992, 19050.4, 19050.5, 19052, 19055, 19057.1, 19057.3, 19058, 19063, 19063.1, 19063.4, 19063.8, 19172, 19180, 19232, 19233, 19236, 19237, 19240, 19241, 19242, 19242.2, 19242.8, 19243, 19243.2, 19600, 19600.1, 19602, 19603, 19606, 19609, 19701, 19702.5, 19705, 19790, 19792, 19792.5, 19794, 19795, 19798.5, 19816.4, and 19816.6 of, to add Sections 18501, 18502, and 18521.5 to, to add Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 18660) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 5 of Title 2 of, to repeal Sections 19815.2 and 19816.22 of, and to repeal and add Section 19702 of, the Government Code, relating to human resources.
Title
Human resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1309 Negrete McLeod Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1309 Negrete McLeod Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1309 Negrete McLeod (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1309 Negrete McLeod Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1309 Negrete McLeod (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4627.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-16 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5972.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-10 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-05-03 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3402.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3388.) (April 30). | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3022.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing March 26. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |