CA SB1300 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.91 (commencing with Section 14129) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Medi-Cal: emergency medical transport providers: quality assurance fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1300 Hernandez Urgency Clause Concurr (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1300 Hernandez Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1300 Hernandez Third Reading Urgency ByA& A.R. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1300 Hernandez Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1300 Hernandez Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1300 Hernandez Third Reading Urgency ByA& A.R. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1300 Hernandez Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-27 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-27 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5407.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6095.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5964.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4107.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4007.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3646.) (April 20). |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14129 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |