CA SB1291 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 65850.7 of the Government Code, relating to energy.
Title
Hydrogen-fueling stations: administrative approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1291 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1291 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Archuleta et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1291 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Archuleta et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5342.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6003.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3901.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3522.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3460.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in TRANS. pending receipt. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., TRANS., and E.Q. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65850.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |