CA SB1284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7.2 (commencing with Section 160) to Division 1 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employers: annual report: pay data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 17).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code160New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback