CA SB128 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to community facilities districts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community facilities districts: transfer of governance authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-22 - Assembly - SB 128 Emmerson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB128 Emmerson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-06 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2013-08-22SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2013-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-06-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and ED.
2013-05-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-20SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-05-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 880.) (May 8).
2013-04-23SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2013-04-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2013-04-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-31SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22.
2013-01-22SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code921Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_128&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130122_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130415_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130515_amended_sen_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130515_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130122_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130415_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130515_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130823_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20130906_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20130508_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20130520_0127PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20130626_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20130814_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20130822_1019AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback