CA SB1276 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 127400, 127405, 127420, 127425, 127450, 127454, and 127455 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care billing.
Title
Health care: fair billing policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1276 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1276 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1276 Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1276 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1276 Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 758, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4474.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 5965.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (June 24). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3594.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3162.) (April 9). |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 127455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |