CA SB127 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.6 (commencing with Section 13486) to Division 7 of the Water Code, relating to water, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Water and Wastewater Loan and Grant Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | March 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.6.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13486 | New Code | See Bill Text |