CA SB1269 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12177.5 to the Government Code, relating to liability.
Title
Food donation liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1269 Oropeza Senate Third Reading By COTO (Y: 48 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1269 Oropeza (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1269 Oropeza (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2010-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2010-08-17 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-16 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 6239.) To Senate. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 30). | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.) | |
2010-06-10 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2010-05-28 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-28 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 6. Page 3654.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-13 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-05-12 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2010-05-04 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3305.) | |
2010-04-14 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-01 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-03-23 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |