CA SB1263 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 116540 of, and to add Section 116527 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 106.4 to the Water Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Public water system: permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1263 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1263 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 43 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1263 Wieckowski Motion to Reconsider By GARCIA, E (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1263 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1263 Wieckowski (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1263 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 43 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1263 Wieckowski Motion to Reconsider By GARCIA, E (Y: 50 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1263 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1263 Wieckowski (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 843, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 5476.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 30. Page 6307.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 5980.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 39. Noes 30. Page 5928.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Eduardo Garcia. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3). |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 28). |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W. |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 3806.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116527 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 106.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |