CA SB1262 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69842 of the Government Code, relating to courts.
Title
Courts: indexes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1262 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Cervantes (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Bradford (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3862.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69842 | Amended Code | Citation Text |