CA SB1262 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 66473.7 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 10910 of the Water Code, relating to land use.
Title
Water supply planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1262 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1262 Pavley Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Pavley (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1262 Pavley Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1262 Pavley (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5363.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5894.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5473.) |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and L. GOV. |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 3952.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3609.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3313.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66473.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |