CA SB1261 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 24 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4114.5 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire prevention: firefighting aircraft: pilot death benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1261 Nielsen Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1261 Nielsen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1261 Nielsen Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5692.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6517.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-07AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4338.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4787.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code893Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4114.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback