CA SB1236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35012 of the Education Code, relating to school districts.
Title
School districts: governing boards: pupil members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1236 Glazer et al (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3457.) (April 20). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 35012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |