CA SB1222 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - April 6 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - April 6 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51934 and 51938 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Comprehensive sexual health education and human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) prevention education.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [03-31-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [03-30-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [03-30-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | April 6 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | March 30 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 3272.) Reconsideration granted. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51938 | Amended Code | Citation Text |